Abraham Atachbarian v. Capital One Financial Corporation DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Abraham Atachbarian
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02944
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-06965. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2915, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Virginia and assigned to Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. Case transferred electronically. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF JPML DECISION filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - JPML Decision-Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1))(Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Counsel shall file a status report within five (5) days of the MDL Panels decision. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pending Resolution of the Motions for Transfer and Consolidation before Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (UNOPPOSED) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation, (Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pending Resolution of the Motions for Transfer and Consolidation before Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (UNOPPOSED) filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John R Lawless, Jr added to party Capital One Financial Corporation(pty:dft)) (Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:19-cv-01431 JGB(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06965 JGB(SPx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lynda J Grant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff ABRAHAM ATACHBARIAN. Related Case(s): 19-cv-01431-JGB-SP (Bishop, Patrice) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABRAHAM ATACHBARIAN, (Bishop, Patrice) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ABRAHAM ATACHBARIAN. (Bishop, Patrice) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABRAHAM ATACHBARIAN. (Bishop, Patrice) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24240334 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ABRAHAM ATACHBARIAN. (Attorney Patrice L Bishop added to party ABRAHAM ATACHBARIAN(pty:pla))(Bishop, Patrice) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham Atachbarian v. Capital One Financial Corporation DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Atachbarian
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: John R. Lawless, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?