HAQUE v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Zakaria Haque
Defendant: Capital One, National Association, Capital One Bank (USA) National Association and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02969
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Pretrial Order #5 re electronic filings and foreign attorney's. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences; directing that the presently scheduled Status and 16(b) Conferences for 1/29/2020 at 10:00 am are now scheduled for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 am. (See order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Pretrial Order #3 - Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Order #2 - Appointing Defendants' Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, c/m 11/12/2019)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Order. Pretrial Order #1 Setting Initial Conference and General Matters. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 11/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-03512. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2019 Original record transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia via interdistrict transfer system. (md) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO -1): PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF OCTOBER 2, 2019, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ANTHONY J. TRENGA. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION TO STAY UNTIL THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION RESOLVES THE MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION AND TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 FILED IN IN RE CAPITAL ONE CONSUMER DATA BREACH LITIGATION, MDL NO. 2915 (J.P.M.L. JULY 31, 2019). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/4/19. 9/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Stay or, In the Alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by ZAKARIA HAQUE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RUSSELL, MARY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RIA CECILIA MOMBLANCO on behalf of ZAKARIA HAQUE (MOMBLANCO, RIA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY L. RUSSELL on behalf of ZAKARIA HAQUE (RUSSELL, MARY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(SEE PAPER #3 FOR PDF)(md) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay or, In the Alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Brief, Certification of No Opposition and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Brief - Proposed Order Staying Case, #3 Exhibit B to Brief - Proposed Alternative Order Extending Time to Answer, #4 Certificate of No Opposition to Alternative Form of Relief, #5 Certificate of Service)(MARKOVICH, INEZ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Statement (Corporate Disclosure Statement) by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (MARKOVICH, INEZ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO FORTHWITH SERVE A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND THIS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS, AND/OR, IF KNOWN, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS. ADDITIONAL INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN, REGARDING PRESERVATION OF RECORDS, ADMISSION OF COUNSEL, STAY OF DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS AND DISCOVERY PROCEEDINGS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/5/19. 8/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 2, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ZAKARIA HAQUE. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 2, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 8/5/19 (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE201523.) filed by ZAKARIA HAQUE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAQUE v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Inez M. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) National Association
Represented By: Inez M. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Inez M. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zakaria Haque
Represented By: Roberta Dayvette Liebenberg
Represented By: Ria Cecilia Momblanco
Represented By: Mary L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?