Kalani v. Jensen et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Yashar S. Kalani
Defendant: John Gaughen and Mary E. Jensen
Case Number: 1:2020cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 So Ordered re #5 NOTICE. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/24/2020. (lcre, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mohammad Yashar S. Kalani /Notice of Dismissal (DiMuro, Bernard)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have through and including January 29, 2020 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/10/2020. (lcre, )
January 10, 2020 John Gaughen answer due 1/29/2020; Mary E. Jensen answer due 1/29/2020. (lcre, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by John Gaughen, Mary E. Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swauger, Jessica)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Becker Mumford, Jr on behalf of John Gaughen, Mary E. Jensen (Mumford, John)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7011628.), filed by John Gaughen, Mary E. Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swauger, Jessica)
January 7, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalani v. Jensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gaughen
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Ann Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Jensen
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Ann Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Yashar S. Kalani
Represented By: Stacey Rose Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?