Figueroa-Ibarry v. Rennick et al
Plaintiff: Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry
Defendant: Kevin B. Rennick and Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:19-cv-01541. Original file and docket sheet received.
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Change Venue; granting #10 Motion requesting Order "Motion allowed. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 (a) this case is transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia for all further proceedings. The plaintiff is directed to make service on the Attorney General as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2) and (3)." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 1/8/2020. (EES) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Submitting evidence of canceled insurance as retaliation filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 1/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(gav) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue , MOTION requesting Order filed by Fidel A. Sevillano-Del-Rio on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sevillano-Del-Rio, Fidel) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION requesting Order filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 9/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/18/2019. (EES) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Affidavit of Service filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(gav) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, Kevin B. Rennick (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/5/2019. (EES) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/5/2019. (EES) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 6/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(gav) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Responses due by 6/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark T. Esper, Kevin B. Rennick, filed by Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry, Pro se. Service due by 9/3/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 EEOC Reconsideration, #5 EEOC Decision, #6 Brief in Support of Appeal)(gav) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 1/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa-Ibarry v. Rennick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Rennick
Represented By: Fidel A. Sevillano-Del-Rio
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Represented By: Fidel A. Sevillano-Del-Rio
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia H. Figueroa-Ibarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?