Addiction Recovery Services, LLC v. Crossroads Holding, LLC
Plaintiff: Addiction Recovery Services, LLC
Defendant: Crossroads Holding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00067
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED re #14 Agreed Order for Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/20/2020. (dvanm, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement and Agreed Order for Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment by Addiction Recovery Services, LLC (DePalma, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Crossroads Holding, LLC.(Buchanan, Thomas)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time for Crossroads to respond to the Complaint is extended to and including February 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/20/2020. (wgar, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crossroads Holding, LLC. (Buchanan, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension (Unopposed) by Crossroads Holding, LLC. (Buchanan, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Buchanan on behalf of Crossroads Holding, LLC (Buchanan, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Crossroads Holding, LLC on January 29, 2020, filed by Addiction Recovery Services, LLC. (Schreiber, Christian)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action Regarding a Patent or Trademark as to 88718503 (Trademark Application Number/Pending). (pmil, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Crossroads Holding, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
January 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (pmil, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Addiction Recovery Services, LLC. (Schreiber, Christian)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin William Weigand on behalf of Addiction Recovery Services, LLC (Weigand, Kevin)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Martin DePalma on behalf of Addiction Recovery Services, LLC (DePalma, Nicholas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Addiction Recovery Services, LLC. (Schreiber, Christian)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7036927.), filed by Addiction Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schreiber, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addiction Recovery Services, LLC v. Crossroads Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addiction Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?