Klayman v. Fitton
Plaintiff: Larry Klayman
Defendant: Thomas J. Fitton
Case Number: 1:2020cv00135
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff provide the Clerk's Office with a current mailing address no later than Friday, April 10,2020. Failure to comply with this Order, and failure to keep a currentmailing address on record with this court, may result in dismissal of this civil action. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/30/2020. (See order for further details).(acha, ) Copies sent as directed in the order.
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER For these reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's #6 Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss be and is DENIED AS MOOT because defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be resolved on the papers submitted without oral argument. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/30/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mail as directed in order.
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Thomas J. Fitton re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, #5 Notice of Hearing Date WITHDRAWING NOTICE OF HEARING (Driscoll, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Continue filed by Thomas J. Fitton. (Driscoll, Richard)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Thomas J. Fitton re #8 Order,,, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Driscoll, Richard)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by Thomas J. Fitton (Driscoll, Richard)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - On March 3,2020, defendant Thomas J. Fitton ("defendant" or "Fitton") filed a Motion to Dismiss in this civil action brought by plaintiff pro se Larry Klayman ("plaintiff' or "Klayman").^ When a plaintiff is proceeding pro se. the defendant must give the plaintiff the notice required under Local Rule 7(K) and Roseboro v. Garrison. 528 F.2d 309 (4th Cir. 1975)when filing any dispositive motion. Defendant did provide any such notice in conjunction withhis Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that within 5 days of the date of entry of this Order, defendant provide the appropriate Roseboro notice to plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/13/2020. (dvanm, c/s 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Continue by Larry Klayman. (acha, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss by Larry Klayman. (acha, )
March 12, 2020 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Continue. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
March 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Per CK) (clar, )
March 3, 2020 Notice of Correction re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief in the future. (clar, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Driscoll, Richard)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Thomas J. Fitton. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Driscoll, Richard)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14683083283. (acha, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to: Thomas J. Fitton by SPS. (acha, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas J. Fitton ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683083283.), filed by Larry Klayman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 Transcript of Thomas J. Fitton, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klayman v. Fitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Fitton
Represented By: Richard W. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?