Ali v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Liaquat Ali
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc. and Champlain Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date AMENDED set for June 26, 2020 re #5 Notice of Hearing Date, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #7 Reply, #4 Memorandum in Support (Winegardner, Douglas)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Reply to #6 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (B)(6) filed by Champlain Enterprises, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Winegardner, Douglas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liaquat Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (United Boarding Pass))(Landau, Douglas)
February 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 17, 2020 re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Notice of Correction, #4 Memorandum in Support (Winegardner, Douglas)
February 19, 2020 Notice of Correction re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date. (klau, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Champlain Enterprises, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Winegardner, Douglas)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Champlain Enterprises, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Winegardner, Douglas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by Champlain Enterprises, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Winegardner, Douglas)
February 13, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal, An incomplete (missing Civil Cover Sheet) document was file. The filing user has been notified to file a Civil Cover Sheet.(klau, )
February 13, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Loudoun County Circuit Court ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7072161.), filed by Champlain Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Commutair, United Airlines, Inc.. (No Answer Filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service Champlain, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of Service United, #4 Exhibit Entity Information Champlain, #5 Exhibit Entity Information United)(Winegardner, Douglas) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaquat Ali
Represented By: Douglas Keith Wagner Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?