Stacy Plays Brands, LLC v. stacyplays.com
Plaintiff: Stacy Plays Brands, LLC
Defendant: stacyplays.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv00172
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of D. Weslow)(Barnes, Attison)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration re #7 Order on Motion for Service by Publication by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Barnes, Attison)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Order to Publish Notice of Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 02/28/2020. (See Order for Details)(choy, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of re #4 MOTION for Service by Publication Hearing by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC (Barnes, Attison)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of David E. Weslow)(Barnes, Attison)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Barnes, Attison)
February 19, 2020 Notice of Correction in re: #2 Financial Disclosure Statement. The filing user has been notified that document is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (choy, )
February 19, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Barnes, Attison)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7080655.), filed by Stacy Plays Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Attison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacy Plays Brands, LLC v. stacyplays.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Plays Brands, LLC
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stacyplays.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?