Jewels Connection, Inc. v. OroClub.com et al
Plaintiff: Jewels Connection, Inc.
Defendant: OroClub.com and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00364
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 Preliminary Injunction BOND in the amount of $500.00 posted by Jewels Connection, Inc. (rban, )
May 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant OroClub.com (clar, )
May 15, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant OroClub.com. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date for June 26, 2020 re #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant OroClub.com (Barnes, Attison)
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant OroClub.com filed by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Barnes, Attison)
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant OroClub.com by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum setting forth the factual and legal support for the following findings (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/12/2020. (lcre, )(c/s)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that: 1. Verisign, Jnc. is HEREBY DIRECTED to change the registrar of the OroCtub.com domain name to GoDaddy.com, LLC and GoDaddy.com, LLC is directed to return the registration and control of the domain name to Plaintiff until further order from this Court, to restore the status quo prior to the apparent hijacking of the domain name; 2. A bond in the amount of $500 shall be posted;3. Plaintiff shall provide a copy of this order to Verisign, Inc. and GoDaddy.com. LLC, and to the current registrant via the email currently listed in the WHOIS record for the OroClub.com domain name. . Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/12/2020. (lcre, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jewels Connection, Inc. (lcre, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of A. Kosak))(Kosak, Adrienne)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration Regarding Publication of Order to Publish Notice of Action by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Regarding Publication)(Barnes, Attison)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that a copy of this Order be published in either The Washington Post or The Washington Times within fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order and that a declaration be filed on Plaintiff's behalf, no later than twenty-one (21) days after the entry of this Order, describing the steps that have been taken to comply with this Order (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 4/14/2020. (lcre, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of re #6 MOTION for Service by Publication Waiver of Hearing by Jewels Connection, Inc. (Kosak, Adrienne)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of A. Kosak))(Kosak, Adrienne)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by Publication by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kosak, Adrienne)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Waiver of Hearing by Jewels Connection, Inc. (Barnes, Attison)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of H. Golshirazian)(Barnes, Attison)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
April 1, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Barnes, Attison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7143722.), filed by Jewels Connection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Attison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewels Connection, Inc. v. OroClub.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OroClub.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewels Connection, Inc.
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Represented By: Adrienne Johnson Kosak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?