Toure et al v. Hott et al
Defendant: Paul Perry and Jeffery Crawford
Petitioner: Ummy Mohamed, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Melvin Castro, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Francois Toure, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos and Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don
Respondent: Mathew Albence, Field Office Dir. Russell Hott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Colonel Paul Perry and Matthew T. Albence
Case Number: 1:2020cv00395
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 So Ordered re #34 NOTICE. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal. #34 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i), Plaintiff-Petitioners Melvin Castro and Venacio Escobar Andasol are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/24/2020. (dvanm, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #8 Memorandum in Support, of Dismissal of Petitioners Melvin Castro and Venacio Escobar Andasol (Appelbaum, Adina)
May 13, 2020 Filing 38 USCA Case Number 20-6695 4th Circuit, A. Walker, Case Manager, for #35 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Francois Toure, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Ummy Mohamed. (acha, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 So Ordered re #34 NOTICE of Dismissal, filed by Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Francois Toure, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Ummy Mohamed. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/12/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #35 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (acha, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #33 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0422-7197246. (Appelbaum, Adina)
May 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure re #33 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #8 Memorandum in Support, of Dismissal of Petitioner Faustino Romero Aguilon (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #7 Motion for TRO; denying #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/29/2020. (awac, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 So Ordered re #28 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Francois Toure, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Ummy Mohamed. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/28/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 31 Response to #27 NOTICE,, filed by Jeffery Crawford. (Erbach, John)
April 27, 2020 Filing 30 Response to #27 NOTICE,, filed by Matthew T. Albence, Russell Hott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Mezger, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4-24-20, before Judge Liam O'Grady, Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 703. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2020.(wallace, scott)
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Dismissal of Petitioner Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #22 Reply to Response to Motion,, #26 Motion Hearing,,,, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #8 Memorandum in Support, of Supplemental Evidence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Modeling COVID-19 and impacts on U.S. Immigration and Enforcement (ICE) detention facilities, 2020)(Appelbaum, Adina)
April 24, 2020 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2020 re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Francois Toure, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Ummy Mohamed, #9 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Francois Toure, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Ummy Mohamed. Counsel enter their appearances and present arguments. Court takes matters under advisement. (Court Reporter S. Wallace.)(awac, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Russell Hott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Barghaan, Dennis)
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Donovan, Kristin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg on behalf of Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
April 23, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Appelbaum, Adina)
April 23, 2020 Per LO chambers motions set for 4/24/2020 will be heard telephonically (clar, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew T. Albence, Russell Hott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REX 1, #2 Exhibit REX 2, #3 Exhibit REX 3, #4 Exhibit REX 4, #5 Exhibit REX 5, #6 Exhibit REX 6, #7 Exhibit REX 7)(Mezger, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 So Ordered re #16 NOTICE, filed by Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Melvin Castro, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Francois Toure, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Ummy Mohamed, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos and Ronaldo Lopez Cristales terminated. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/21/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sirine Shebaya. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/21/2020. (acha, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Amber Qureshi. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/21/2020. (acha, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeffery Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Crawford Declaration, #2 Moore Declaration)(Erbach, John)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Dismissal of Petitioners-Plaintiffs Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos and Ronaldo Lopez Cristales (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure of Transfer of Petitioner-Plaintiff Venacio Escobar Andasol (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kasey Leigh Hoare on behalf of Jeffery Crawford (Hoare, Kasey)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sirine Shebaya and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7165771. by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Erbach on behalf of Jeffery Crawford (Erbach, John)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Mezger on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Russell Hott, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Mezger, Matthew)
April 17, 2020 Notice of Correction re #4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sirine Shebaya and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7154422. . The filing user has been notified that document #4 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. Also, an incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (acha, )
April 17, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment , #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date set for 4/24/2020 re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment , #8 Memorandum in Support, (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Memorandum in Support, , MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Appelbaum, Adina)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Amber Qureshi, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Amina ElGammal, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Prabha Ranjanee Kumaragame, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Schmelzel, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Ana Dionne-Lanier, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Karla Perez Chacon, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Lorna Julien, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Schmelzel, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Lindsay Wardlaw, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Faustino Romero Aguilon, #12 Exhibit Declaration of Ashley I. Warmerling, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Robert B. Greifinger, MD, #14 Exhibit Declaration of Jhumka Gupta, ScD, MPH)(Appelbaum, Adina)
April 10, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Fisher Donovan on behalf of Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure (Donovan, Kristin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Granville Clayton Warner on behalf of Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure (Warner, Granville)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sirine Shebaya and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7154422. by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amber Qureshi and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7154419. by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), by Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Melvin Castro, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Ummy Mohamed, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Appelbaum, Adina)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-7154160.), filed by Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don, Ronaldo Lopez Cristales, Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez, Ummy Mohamed, Venacio Escobar Andasol, Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos, Faustino Romero Aguilon, Francois Toure. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Appelbaum, Adina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toure et al v. Hott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mathew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Dir. Russell Hott
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colonel Paul Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ummy Mohamed
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Venacio Escobar Andasol
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Franklin (Rechelle) Alberto Hernandez
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Faustino Romero Aguilon
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin Castro
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronaldo Lopez Cristales
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francois Toure
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Chavez Ramos
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sisira Kumara Kumaragamage Don
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Granville Clayton Warner
Represented By: Kristin Fisher Donovan
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?