The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Zhang et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company Of America and The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Frank Zhang and pru.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv00450
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2020 re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by pru.com, Frank Zhang.Mark Partridge, Nicholas DePalma and Charles Griger appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Justin Mercer and Paul Vangellow appeared on behalf of the defendant.Matter argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. Court Reporter: P. Kaneshiro-Miller(tran)
June 18, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Frank Zhang, pru.com. (Vangellow, Paul)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer venue (Dkt. #17 ) is RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, July 1, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. and that the hearing will be HELD TELEPHONICALLY. It is further ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to comply with the Courtroom Deputy's instructions regarding the procedure for participation in the telephonic hearing on July 1, 2020, at 11 :00 a.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/16/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice for Justin H.R. Mercer. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/16/2020. (acha, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin H.R. Mercer and Certification of Local Counsel Paul P. Vangellow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7248436. by Frank Zhang, pru.com. (Vangellow, Paul)
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles G. Giger)(Weigand, Kevin)
June 1, 2020 Notice of Correction re [17-1] Memorandum, The filing user has been notified for future filing, memorandum should be filed separate and link it to the motion. (klau, )
June 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Hearing Date set for 06/26/2020 re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Vangellow, Paul)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Frank Zhang, pru.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Declaration)(Vangellow, Paul)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul P. Vangellow on behalf of Frank Zhang, pru.com (Vangellow, Paul)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration re #14 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, of Mark Van Buren Partridge Regarding Compliance with May 5, 2020 Order by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weigand, Kevin)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PUBLISH NOTICE OF ACTION re #11 Motion for an Order to Publish Notice of Action ORDERED that 1. That a copy of this order be published in either The Washington Times or The Washington Post within fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order ----- 5. That the foregoing steps shall be deemed to constitute service of the Complaint on Defendant pru.com pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 1125(d)(2)(A)(ii) (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 5/5/20. (klau, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America re #11 MOTION for an Order to Publish Notice of Action (Waiver of Hearing) (Weigand, Kevin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION for an Order to Publish Notice of Action filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark V.B. Partridge)(Weigand, Kevin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for an Order to Publish Notice of Action by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weigand, Kevin)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/30/20. (klau, )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/30/20. (klau, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Gregory Giger and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Martin DePalma Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7181434. by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (DePalma, Nicholas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Van Buren Partridge and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Martin DePalma Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7181432. by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (DePalma, Nicholas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Frank Zhang. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two e issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
April 23, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Prudential Insurance Company Of America of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Weigand, Kevin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Martin DePalma on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company Of America (DePalma, Nicholas)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Prudential Insurance Company Of America. (Weigand, Kevin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Prudential Insurance Company Of America. (Weigand, Kevin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against pru.com, Fran Zhang ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7172551.), filed by Prudential Insurance Company Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weigand, Kevin) Modified text on 4/23/2020 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Zhang
Represented By: Paul P. Vangellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pru.com
Represented By: Paul P. Vangellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Nicholas Martin DePalma
Represented By: Kevin William Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Nicholas Martin DePalma
Represented By: Kevin William Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?