Bitar v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Amira Bitar
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf, Christopher Wray, Mark Koumans, William Barr and Sarah Taylor
Case Number: 1:2020cv00511
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that Plaintiff Amira Bitar's application to become a naturalized citizen of the United States is REMANDED to USCIS so that the agency may timely and promptly adjudication Plaintiffs application; and it is furtherORDERED that all parties shall bear their own fees and costs. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/05/2020. (dvanm, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amira Bitar. Sarah Taylor served on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service by Christopher Wray, Chad F. Wolf, Mark Koumans, Sarah Taylor, William Barr. All Defendants. (Mezger, Matthew)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Mezger on behalf of William Barr, Mark Koumans, Sarah Taylor, Chad F. Wolf, Christopher Wray (Mezger, Matthew)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Mark Koumans, Sarah Taylor, Chad F. Wolf, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Amira Bitar. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Wray, #2 Summons for Koumans, #3 Summons for Taylor, #4 Summons for Barr, #5 Summons for Terwilliger)(Sabagh, Denyse)
May 5, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Amira Bitar. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - Barr, #2 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - Terwilliger, #3 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - Taylor, #4 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - Wray, #5 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION - Wolf)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ).
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint -Petition for Hearing on Naturalization Application ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7190558.), filed by Amira Bitar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sabagh, Denyse) (Attachment 8 replaced on 5/6/2020) (dvanm, ). Modified #8 to replace fillable form on 5/6/2020 (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bitar v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amira Bitar
Represented By: Denyse Sabagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?