Rhoujdami v. Royal Air Maroc, LTD.
Plaintiff: SAYSHDINE RHOUJDAMI and SAYF DINE RHOUJDAMI
Defendant: ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00645
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Clement Robinett on behalf of SAYF DINE RHOUJDAMI (Robinett, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Maggio. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/27/2020. (aott)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Maggio and Certification of Local Counsel Brian E. Foont Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7312184. by ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD.. (Foont, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD.. (Foont, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD..(Foont, Brian)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAYF DINE RHOUJDAMI ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD. served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020 (Miller, Craig)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS Issued as to ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by SAYSHDINE RHOUJDAMI as to SAYSHDINE RHOUJDAMI. (Miller, Craig)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #4 Amended Complaint by SAYF DINE RHOUJDAMI. (Miller, Craig) Modified on 6/11/2020 to correct filer's data entry error (acha, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD., filed by SAYF DINE RHOUJDAMI.(Miller, Craig) Modified on 6/11/2020 to correct filing data entry error (acha, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD. by SAYSHDINE RHOUJDAMI. (Miller, Craig) (Main Document replaced on 6/10/2020) (acha, ). Modified on 6/10/2020 as one time courtesy to correct error (acha, ) Modified on 6/10/2020 (acha, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7240892.), filed by SAYSHDINE RHOUJDAMI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Craig)
June 10, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoujdami v. Royal Air Maroc, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL AIR MAROC, LTD.
Represented By: Brian Edward Foont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAYSHDINE RHOUJDAMI
Represented By: Craig Douglas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAYF DINE RHOUJDAMI
Represented By: Craig Douglas Miller
Represented By: Michael Clement Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?