The Danville Group v. Carmax Business Services, LLC
Plaintiff: The Danville Group, Inc. d/b/a Rootstock Software and The Danville Group a California corporation doing business as Rootstock Software
Defendant: Carmax Business Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00696
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by The Danville Group as to Carmax Business Services, LLC. (Champaign, Lauren)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/2/20. (klau, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Danville Group. Carmax Business Services, LLC waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Champaign, Lauren) Modified on 7/2/2020 to correct waiver sent and answer date (klau, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Carmax Business Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED as follows: (1) The Clerk shall AMEND Plaintiff's name in the CM/ECF system and electronic docket to: The Danville Group d/b/a Rootstock Software; (2) The Clerk shall REPLACE: (1) the complaint (Dkt. 1-1) with docket number 6-1; (1) the proposed summons (Dkt. 2) with docket number 6-2; and (3) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dkt. 3) with docket number 6-3; and (3) The Clerk shall RE-ISSUE the Proposed Summons (attached as docket number 6-2), containing Plaintiff's amended name. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 6/25/20. (klau, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Danville Group, Inc. (Champaign, Lauren)
June 25, 2020 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Danville Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Champaign, Lauren)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carmax Business Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
June 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eileen Ridley and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren Champaign Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7259478. by The Danville Group, Inc. d/b/a Rootstock Software. (Champaign, Lauren)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Danville Group, Inc. d/b/a Rootstock Software. (Champaign, Lauren) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/25/2020) (klau, ). Modified on 6/25/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement replaced per Order dated 6/25/20 (klau, ).
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by The Danville Group, Inc. d/b/a Rootstock Software. (Champaign, Lauren) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2020) (klau, ). Modified on 6/25/2020 proposed summons replaced per Order dated 6/25/20 (klau, ).
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7259041.), filed by The Danville Group, Inc. d/b/a Rootstock Software. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 1, #3 Exhibit 1, part 1, #4 Exhibit 1, part 1, #5 Exhibit 1, part 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Champaign, Lauren) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/25/2020) (klau, ). Modified on 6/25/2020 Complaint (dkt.1-1) replaced per Order dated 6/25/20 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Danville Group v. Carmax Business Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax Business Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Danville Group, Inc. d/b/a Rootstock Software
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Champaign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Danville Group a California corporation doing business as Rootstock Software
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Champaign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?