Reyes v. Daniel O'Connell's Irish Restaurant, LLC
Plaintiff: LEIBY MEJIA REYES
Defendant: DANIEL O'CONNELL'S IRISH RESTAURANT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00716
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #7 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 29, 2020, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's July 2, 2020, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 7/24/2020. (lgue, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by Daniel O'Connell's Irish Restaurant, LLC.(Amundson, Martin)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Thomas George Collins. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/2020. (acha, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas George Collins and Certification of Local Counsel Martin J. Amundson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7291006. by Daniel O'Connell's Irish Restaurant, LLC. (Amundson, Martin)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis.Discovery due by 11/27/2020.Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do not file dispositive motions).Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/02/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Daniel O'Connell's Irish Restaurant, LLC.(Amundson, Martin)
June 25, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL O'CONNELL'S IRISH RESTAURANT, LLC. (Amundson, Martin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Circuit Court for the City of Alexandria ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7266740.), filed by DANIEL O'CONNELL'S IRISH RESTAURANT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amundson, Martin) Modified on 6/25/2020 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Daniel O'Connell's Irish Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL O'CONNELL'S IRISH RESTAURANT, LLC
Represented By: Martin John Amundson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEIBY MEJIA REYES
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?