Burke v. Capital One Bank(USA), N.A.
Plaintiff: Mark Burke
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00742
Filed: July 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Burke. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Shirkey, Hyatt)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Counsel for Plaintiff is advised that the requisite signature on all future pleadings shall include Counsel's full name. Failure to provide a complete legal signature may result in the rejection of future submissions to this Court. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/09/2020. (jlan)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Octavio Gomez and Certification of Local Counsel Hyatt Shirkey. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/07/2020. (jlan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Mark Burke. (Shirkey, Hyatt)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Octavio Gomez and Certification of Local Counsel Hyatt Shirkey Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7284389. by Mark Burke. (Shirkey, Hyatt)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7284373.), filed by Mark Burke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shirkey, Hyatt)
July 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Capital One Bank(USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Burke
Represented By: Hyatt Browning Shirkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?