Patterson v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Richard Allen Patterson
Defendant: Doris Jacobs and Ernest Bower
Case Number: 1:2020cv00798
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Allen Patterson. (shea)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Prisoner Complaint by Richard Allen Patterson. (shea)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m 7/21/2020 shea)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 (DOCKETED IN ERROR- DUPLICATIVE TO #2 ) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Allen Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shea) Modified on 7/17/2020 (shea, ).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Allen Patterson. (shea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Envelope) (shea, ).
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Ernest Bower, Doris Jacobs, filed by Richard Allen Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Allen Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?