Kelly v. Clark
Petitioner: Allen Antonius Kelly
Respondent: Harold Clark
Case Number: 1:2020cv00805
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the petition be and is FILED; and it is further ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, respondent show cause why the writ should not be granted. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 09/11/2020. (dvanm, c/m 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/11/2020 to correct spelling (wgar, ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14683086293 (aott, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that the petition be and is conditionally filed pending compliance with the requirements of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that petitioner is assessed a filing fee of $5.00 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/24/2020. (dvanm, c/m 7/24/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Huffstutter on behalf of Harold Clark (Huffstutter, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Allen Antonius Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Data Sheet, #3 Memo, #4 Table of Contents, #5 State Court Records 1, #6 State Court Records 2, #7 State Court Records 3, #8 State Court Records 4 - Part 1, #9 State Court Records 4 - Part 2, #10 Envelope)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Antonius Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold Clark
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Huffstutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?