Mendoza v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joel A Mendoza, Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Carmax Business Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00808
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Carmax Business Services, LLC terminated.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/26/2020. (shea)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing with prejudice the Complaint only against Carmax Business Services, LLC; directing that the court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement of the parties and the prior Orders in this case; directing that this matter continues as to the remaining defendants. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/26/2020. (see order for details)(shea)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/12/2020. (shea)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carmax Business Services, LLC. (Wingfield, Alan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Carmax Business Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wingfield, Alan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Durrum Wingfield on behalf of Carmax Business Services, LLC (Wingfield, Alan)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/10/2020. (shea) Modified on 8/10/2020 (shea, ).
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel A Mendoza, Jr Carmax Business Services, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020 (Kelly, Kristi)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel A Mendoza, Jr Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020 (Kelly, Kristi)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Joel A Mendoza, Jr (Guzzo, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Joel A Mendoza, Jr (Kelly, Kristi)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carmax Business Services, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
July 17, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Joel A Mendoza, Jr. (Nash, Casey)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7305065.), filed by Joel A Mendoza, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nash, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Esther Slater McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax Business Services, LLC
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel A Mendoza, Jr.
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?