Securities and Exchange Commission v. Boice et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Jennifer Mellon, Daniel K. Boice, Trustify, Inc. and GoLean DC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00853
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission Daniel K. Boice served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; GoLean DC, LLC served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Trustify, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Margida, Nicholas)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Martin Weinstein. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/17/2020. (aott, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Ryan. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/17/2020. (aott, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Jennifer Mellon waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Margida, Nicholas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Ryan and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Stancil Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7349979. by Jennifer Mellon. (Stancil, Mark)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin Weinstein and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Stancil Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7349776. by Jennifer Mellon. (Stancil, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Daniel K. Boice, GoLean DC, LLC, Jennifer Mellon, Trustify, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel K. Boice, GoLean DC, LLC, Jennifer Mellon, Trustify, Inc., filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Margida, Nicholas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Margida, Nicholas)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Chun Barry and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas C. Margida. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/29/2020. (jlan)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen M. Klotz and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas C. Margida. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/29/2020. (jlan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Chun Barry and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas C. Margida by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Margida, Nicholas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen M. Klotz and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas C. Margida by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Margida, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (aott, )
July 24, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons as to Relief Defendant Jennifer Mellon by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Margida, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons as to Relief Defendant GoLean DC, LLC by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Margida, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons as to Defendant Trustify, Inc. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Margida, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons as to Defendant Boice by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Margida, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Margida, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Boice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Mellon
Represented By: Mark Thomas Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel K. Boice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustify, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoLean DC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Nicholas Carlson Margida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?