Gary et al v. Virginia Department of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Carshena Gary, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, John Halverson, Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Lori Scharff and Regina Root
Defendant: Christopher E. Piper, Virginia Department of Elections, Virginia Board of Elections, John O'Bannon, Robert H. Brink and Jamilah D LeCruise
Case Number: 1:2020cv00860
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Joint Motion for Entry of Partial Consent Judgment (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/28/2020. (jlan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 08/28/2020. Appearance of Counsel. Plaintiffs #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction was withdrawn and order entered. (Court Reporter J. Egal)(jlan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 37 Joint Motion for Entry of Partial Consent Judgment and Decree/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Joint Proposal by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Traubert, Steven) Modified text on 8/28/2020 to correct event. (klau, ).
August 26, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Belanger, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Hill)(DeVore, Zachary)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Electronic Device Application; granting #32 Motion for use of courtroom technology. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/26/20. (klau, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 34 Motion for use of Courtroom Technology re #32 Motion for use of Courtroom Technology re #31 MOTION for Electronic Device Application Remote Witness and Telephonic Hearing Access by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff. (Traubert, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Nicholas Regnery on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper, Virginia Board of Elections, Virginia Department of Elections (Regnery, Ronald)
August 24, 2020 Filing 32 Motion for use of Courtroom Technology re #31 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff. (Traubert, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff. (Traubert, Steven)
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 Opposition to #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper, Virginia Board of Elections, Virginia Department of Elections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chris Piper Declaration, #2 Exhibit James Heo Declaration)(Lewis, Carol)
August 21, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaire Hawkins O'Brien on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper, Virginia Board of Elections, Virginia Department of Elections (O'Brien, Blaire)
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Louise Lewis on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper, Virginia Board of Elections, Virginia Department of Elections (Lewis, Carol)
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Hays Lockerman on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper, Virginia Board of Elections, Virginia Department of Elections (Lockerman, Heather)
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff of appearance Pro Hoc Vice by Natalia Szlarb (DeVore, Zachary)
August 21, 2020 Notice of Correction re #26 NOTICE, The filing user has been notified to file a pro hac vice application and pay $75.00 fee. (klau, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/19/20. (klau, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalia Maria Szlarb and Certification of Local Counsel Steven M Traubert Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7349698. by Carshena Gary. (Traubert, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' unopposed motion (Dkt. 22) is GRANTED, it is further ORDERED as follows: (1) Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction ("Motion") by Friday, August 21, 2020; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, by Wednesday, August 26, 2020; and (3) a hearing on this motion before the Honorable Claude Hilton shall be set for Friday, August 28, 2020 at 10:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 08/12/2020. (jlan)
August 12, 2020 Set Deadline as to #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (jlan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite Unopposed by National Federation of the Blind of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Hearing)(Traubert, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Regina Root. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Traubert, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Regina Root. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit NFB VA Declaration, #4 Exhibit ACB VA Declaration, #5 Exhibit Pl Gary Declaration, #6 Exhibit Pl Scharff Declaration, #7 Exhibit Pl Root Declaration, #8 Exhibit Pl Abu-El Hawa Declaration, #9 Exhibit Pl Halverson Declaration, #10 Exhibit Pl Gilbert Declaration)(Traubert, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff of appearance of Eve Hill (DeVore, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff of appearance by Abigail Graber (DeVore, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff of appearance by Steven Hollman (DeVore, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff of appearance by Kailin Banner (DeVore, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff of Appearance by Margaret Hart (DeVore, Zachary)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/5/20. (klau, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/5/20. (klau, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/5/20. (klau, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/5/20. (klau, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/5/20. (klau, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, served on 7/31/20, answer due 9/29/20 by Carshena Gary. All Defendants. (DeVore, Zachary) Modified text on 8/5/2020 to add answer due date (klau, ).
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eve Lynne Hill and Certification of Local Counsel Steven M Traubert Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7330416. by National Federation of the Blind of Virginia. (Traubert, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abigail Alice Graber and Certification of Local Counsel Steven M Traubert Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7330405. by American Council of the Blind of Virginia. (Traubert, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret F Hart and Certification of Local Counsel Steven M Traubert Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7330394. by American Council of the Blind of Virginia. (Traubert, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Paul Hollman and Certification of Local Counsel Steven M Traubert Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7330381. by American Council of the Blind of Virginia, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia. (Traubert, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kaitlin Banner and Certification of Local Counsel Steven M Traubert Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7330355. by American Council of the Blind of Virginia. (Traubert, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Scott DeVore on behalf of Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa, American Council of the Blind of Virginia, Carshena Gary, John Halverson, National Federation of the Blind of Virginia, Regina Root, Lori Scharff (DeVore, Zachary)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint,, Proper PDF resubmission by Regina Root. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Additional Counsel)(Traubert, Steven)
July 28, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
July 28, 2020 Notice of Correction re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, The filing user has been notified that document [1-1] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document.(klau, )
July 28, 2020 Notice of Correction re [1-3] [1-4] Financial Disclosure, The filing user has been notified to file financial disclosure separately for future filing. (klau, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Virginia Department of Elections, Christopher Piper, Virginia Board of Elections, Robert H. Brink, John O'Bannon, Jamilah D. LeCruise ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7322040.), filed by Regina Root. (Attachments: #1 Document filed in error and removed re Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Additional Counsel pending pro hac vice, #3 Affidavit Financial Disclosure ACB-VA, #4 Affidavit Financial Disclosure NFBV)(Traubert, Steven) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (klau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/28/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 7/28/2020 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary et al v. Virginia Department of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carshena Gary
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind of Virginia
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Halverson
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naim Muawia Abu-El Hawa
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Council of the Blind of Virginia
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Scharff
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Root
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Zachary Scott DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher E. Piper
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Department of Elections
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Board of Elections
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Bannon
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Brink
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamilah D LeCruise
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?