Vinglace, LLC v. Occasionally Made LLC
Plaintiff: Vinglace, LLC
Defendant: Occasionally Made LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00906
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Occasionally Made LLC.(Brannon, Clinton)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Occasionally Made LLC d/b/a Swig Life shall have up to and including October 1, 2020 in which to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 08/31/2020. (jlan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Occasionally Made LLC. (Brannon, Clinton)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Occasionally Made LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Clinton)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Howard Brannon on behalf of Occasionally Made LLC (Brannon, Clinton)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Mackenzie Smith on behalf of Occasionally Made LLC (Smith, Janet)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Notice, Original Complaint with Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet as to Occasionally Made LLC served on Niell Jacobsen on 8/11/2020, Answer due 9/1/20 filed by Vinglace, LLC. (Dickinson, Ian) Modified text on 8/17/2020 to add answer due date (klau, ).
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Vinglace, LLC. (Dickinson, Ian)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(shea)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vinglace, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea, )
August 7, 2020 Case transferred in from Richmond Division. Richmond Case Number 3:20-cv-607. Case assigned to Judge District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Vinglac, LLC. (Dickinson, Ian)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7340496.), filed by Vinglace, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickinson, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinglace, LLC v. Occasionally Made LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occasionally Made LLC
Represented By: Clinton Howard Brannon
Represented By: Janet Mackenzie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinglace, LLC
Represented By: Ian R. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?