Pourbabai v. Meiburger, et al.
Appellant: Ben Pourbabai
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Appellee: Janet M. Meiburger and John P. Fitzgerald, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv00910
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The Court now rules that all pending motions in the previously dismissed cases are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/17/2020. (see order for details)(dvanm, copy emailed as directed)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ben Pourbabai (aott, docket updated 9/8/2020 )
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Response to Honorable Judge O'Grady's Show Cause Order (Part 1 of 1) filed by Ben Pourbabai. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(klau, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Set Aside the Entire Fraudulent Bankruptcy Case Based on Rule 60(B) by Ben Pourbabai. (Part 1 of 2) (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(klau, ) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (klau, ).
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Continuance by Ben Pourbabai. (klau, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Ben Pourbabai. (klau, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunction of Judge Kenney's Decisions by Ben Pourbabai. (klau, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Brief (part 1 of 2) filed by Ben Pourbabai. (Attachments: #1 Brief - Part 2 of 2)(klau, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Amended Amended MOTION to Disqualify Judge Liam O'Grady by Ben Pourbabai.(Part 1 of 2) (Attachments: #1 Motion - Part 2 of 2)(klau, ) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (klau, ).
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order - Appellant Brief due by 9/24/2020. (klau, ) Modified on 8/25/2020 copy mailed to pro se Ben Pourbabai (klau, ).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet with designated record received from USBC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record)(klau, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-13560-BFK. File received, filed by Ben Pourbabai. (Attachments: #1 BK Order being Appealed, #2 Transmittal Sheet)(aott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pourbabai v. Meiburger, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ben Pourbabai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janet M. Meiburger
Represented By: Janet M. Meiburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John P. Fitzgerald, III
Represented By: Jack Ira Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?