Star v. The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael Star
Defendant: The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al., Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Tsegaye Tedesse, Pepe Vasquez, Prasert Raumathong, John Doe 1 and Houssein Prichard
Case Number: 1:2020cv00950
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/14/20. Copy mailed by LMB Chambers. (klau, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for the Appointment of an Attorney Under the American with Disabilities Act by Michael Star. (klau, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al., Houssein Prichard, Prasert Raumathong, Tsegaye Tedesse, Pepe Vasquez, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 2, filed by Michael Star.(lcre, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that the Clerk caption plaintiffs Motion for Judgment and Memorandum inSupport Dkt. Nos. [7, 8] as plaintiffs First Amended Complaint re #8 Memorandum in Support filed by Michael Star, #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Star. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/18/2020. (lcre, )(c/s)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Star. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lcre, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment by Michael Star. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lcre, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Qui Tam Action Tax Fraud and Harboring Illegal Aliens. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/03/2020. (dvanm, c/s 9/3/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Qui Tam Action Tax Fraud and Harboring Illegal Aliens by Michael Star. (jlan)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDERED that within 30 days, plaintiff file a proper complaint that sets out the facts related to his "list of violations." Failure to file a proper complaint will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/20/2020. (rban, copy mailed.)
August 19, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m on 8/19/20) (klau, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Star. (klau, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al., filed by Michael Star.(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Star v. The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsegaye Tedesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepe Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prasert Raumathong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houssein Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?