Hyatt v. Iancu
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Case Number: 1:2020cv00983
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. Andrei Iancu served on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 US Attorney EDVA)(DeLaquil, Mark)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Andrew M. Grossman. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 08/27/2020. (dvanm, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew M. Grossman and Certification of Local Counsel Mark W. DeLaquil Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7372627. by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 08/418,213. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(dvanm, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Gilbert P. Hyatt (Proposed AO 120 Form) (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Notice of Correction- The filing user has been notified and asked to prepare and file the AO 120, Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form. (aott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrei Iancu, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
August 21, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to U.S. Attorney for the EDVA by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Attorney General of the United States by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7363483.), filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaquil, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Represented By: Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?