Califorrniaa v. lancu
Plaintiff: Eurica Califorrniaa
Defendant: Hon Andrei lancu
Case Number: 1:2020cv00985
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:154
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney's Office served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (dvanm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 14683086186 (aott, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrei lancu, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (aott,c/m 8/21/2020 )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of a Patent action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(aott )
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrei lancu (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Eurica Califorrniaa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(aott, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Califorrniaa v. lancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Andrei lancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eurica Califorrniaa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?