Hyatt v. Iancu
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Case Number: 1:2020cv00990
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
2 Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Case Reassigned to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. District Judge Anthony J. Trenga no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/03/2021. (dvanm, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
June 8, 2021 Filing 148 Opposition to #144 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
June 4, 2021 Filing 147 Response to #145 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
June 2, 2021 Filing 146 Waiver of Hearing by Gilbert P. Hyatt (DeLaquil, Mark)
June 2, 2021 Filing 145 NOTICE by Andrei Iancu re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Slip Opinion)(Sawert, Peter)
June 2, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(DeLaquil, Mark)
May 10, 2021 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeLaquil, Mark)
May 4, 2021 Filing 142 Opposition to #140 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
April 20, 2021 Filing 141 Waiver of Hearing by Gilbert P. Hyatt (DeLaquil, Mark)
April 20, 2021 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Brief, #2 LeGuyader Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(DeLaquil, Mark)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER that the final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for Thursday, April 15, 2021, be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED, to be rescheduled by subsequent Order. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/12/21. (klau, )
April 9, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/15/2021 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
March 30, 2021 Filing 138 Reply to #137 Opposition,,, filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 137 Opposition to #131 Declaration in accordance with Order #130 filed by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38)(Sawert, Peter)
March 17, 2021 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/17/21 ( #68 #83 #86 Motions), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone Number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2021.(montgomery, rhonda)
March 16, 2021 Filing 134 Redacted version of #117 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition in support of Motion for Discovery Under Rule 56(d). (DeLaquil, Mark)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be SEALED until further order of this Court ---- (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/16/21. (klau, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that the #118 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part ----(see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/16/21. (klau, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 131 Declaration re #130 Order, Supplemental 56(d) Declaration from Mark W. DeLaquil by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeLaquil, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDERED that, within fourteen (14) days of this Order, Plaintiff file a supplemental statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 56(d) in re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d), #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and #98 MOTION Vacate Initial Scheduling Order (see order for further details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/23/2021. (jlan)
February 22, 2021 Filing 129 Redacted version of #104 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition Unredacted Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declaration)(Sawert, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 128 NOTICE by Andrei Iancu re #124 Redacted Document filing Exhibits 1 and 2 to Document #124 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sawert, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 127 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Andrei Iancu re #125 Second MOTION to Seal re #99 and #100 (Sawert, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 126 Memorandum in Support re #125 Second MOTION to Seal re #99 and #100 filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 125 Second MOTION to Seal re #99 and #100 by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawert, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 124 Redacted version of #99 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition, #100 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition . (Sawert, Peter)
February 17, 2021 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2021 re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt, #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt, #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrei Iancu. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant via Zoom. Motions argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
February 16, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE by Gilbert P. Hyatt of Demonstratives (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demonstratives)(DeLaquil, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Filing 121 NOTICE by Andrei Iancu of Demonstratives (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demonstratives)(Chan, Hugham)
February 15, 2021 Filing 120 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Gilbert P. Hyatt (DeLaquil, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 119 Memorandum in Support re #118 MOTION to Seal filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 118 MOTION to Seal by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeLaquil, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 117 Sealed Reply re #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d). (DeLaquil, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Pro hac vice in re Peter Ayers. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/12/2021. (kgall)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Pro hac vice in re Robert McBride. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/12/2021. (kgall)
February 12, 2021 Filing 112 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Ayers and Certification of Local Counsel Dennis C. Barghaan, Jr. by Andrei Iancu. (Barghaan, Dennis)
February 12, 2021 Filing 111 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert McBride and Certification of Local Counsel Dennis C. Barghaan, Jr. by Andrei Iancu. (Barghaan, Dennis)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #101 Motion to Seal and denying #105 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that the Defendant resubmit within 10 days of this Order a new Motion to Seal, along with redacted versions of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, its Reply in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, and its Opposition to Plaintiffs Rule 56(d) Motion for the Courts consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 02/11/2021. (jlan)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #91 Motion to Seal; and it is further ORDERED that the Declaration of Gilbert P. Hyatt, and Exhibit 5, 9, 11, and 17 shall be SEALED until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 02/11/2021. (jlan)
February 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d). Motion Hearing reset for 2/17/2021 at 11:15 AM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
February 5, 2021 Filing 108 Memorandum in Opposition re #98 MOTION Vacate Initial Scheduling Order filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
February 1, 2021 Filing 107 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Andrei Iancu re #105 MOTION to Seal re #104 (Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 106 Memorandum in Support re #105 MOTION to Seal re #104 filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 105 MOTION to Seal re #104 by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 104 Sealed Opposition re #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d). (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Opposition)(Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 103 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Andrei Iancu re #101 MOTION to Seal re #99 and #100 (Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 102 Memorandum in Support re #101 MOTION to Seal re #99 and #100 filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION to Seal re #99 and #100 by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 100 Sealed Opposition re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sawert, Peter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 99 Sealed Reply in support of #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sawert, Peter)
January 29, 2021 Filing 98 MOTION Vacate Initial Scheduling Order by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Hugham)
January 29, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Andrei Iancu (Chan, Hugham)
January 19, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by John Daniel Victor Ferman on behalf of Andrei Iancu (Ferman, John)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re #94 Agreed Motion for Briefing Schedule ORDERED that on or before February 1, 2021, defendant shall file (1) his combined reply memorandum in support ------ ORDERED that the hearings on the pending summary judgment- related motions [ECF Nos. 68, 83, and 86] be, and the same hereby are, CONTINUED to February 17, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., to be held by videoconference with instructions to follow separately (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/13/21. (klau, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 94 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d), #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeLaquil, Mark)
January 13, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d). Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Videoconference before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
January 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
January 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d). Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
January 12, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) (clar, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 93 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Gilbert P. Hyatt (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 92 Memorandum in Support re #91 MOTION to Seal filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 91 MOTION to Seal by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 90 Declaration re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) from Gilbert P. Hyatt by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (Kazenske Declaration), #7 Exhibit 7 (Razavi Declaration), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 (Bawcombe Declaration), #14 Exhibit 14 (Wong Declaration), #15 Exhibit 15 (Fears Declaration), #16 Exhibit 16 (Harrison Declaration), #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 89 Declaration re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) from Arthur J. Steiner by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 88 Notice of Hearing Date re #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 87 Memorandum in Support re #86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Grossman Declaration)(DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 86 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Hearing Date re #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 84 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to #83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because Plaintiff's Discovery Plan #81 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 6, 2021, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's December 15, 2020, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by Plaintiff in his Proposed Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: Plaintiff's Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/5/2021. (lgue, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 81 Discovery Plan by Gilbert P. Hyatt.(DeLaquil, Mark)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER directing that the hearing currently scheduled in this matter for Wednesday, February 3. 2021 be, and the same hereby is, continued to Wednesday, February 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom videoconferencing. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/18/2020. (shea)
December 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (shea)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #70 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that the parties resubmit the Motion with a redacted version of Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Summary Judgment Motion Based on Prosecution Laches and Undue Multiplicity [Dkt. No. 69] for the Court's consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/17/20. (klau, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Seal, ORDERED that the Administrative Record shall be SEALED until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/17/20. (klau, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 4/9/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
December 14, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Support re #70 MOTION to Seal re #69 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
December 14, 2020 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Support re #64 MOTION to Seal re #12 to #63 Administrative Record filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
December 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AGREED ORDER that, on or before December 7, 2020, defendant shall file his answer and summary judgment papers ---ORDERED that, pursuant to Local Rule 7(F)(l ), the parties are given leave to file opening and opposition summary judgment memorandum no greater than forty (40) pages in length. ORDERED that defendant shall notice his motion for hearing on February 3, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/8/20. (klau, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 73 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/03/2021 re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sawert, Peter)
December 8, 2020 Notice of Correction re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 72 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Andrei Iancu re #70 MOTION to Seal re #69 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 71 Memorandum in Support re #70 MOTION to Seal re #69 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Seal re #69 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 69 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint by Andrei Iancu.(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 66 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Andrei Iancu re #64 MOTION to Seal re #12 to #63 Administrative Record (Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 65 Memorandum in Support re #64 MOTION to Seal re #12 to #63 Administrative Record filed by Andrei Iancu. (Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Seal re #12 to #63 Administrative Record by Andrei Iancu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 63 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 154, #2 Administrative Record Part 155)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 62 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 151, #2 Administrative Record Part 152, #3 Administrative Record Part 153)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 61 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 148, #2 Administrative Record Part 149, #3 Administrative Record Part 150)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 60 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 145, #2 Administrative Record Part 146, #3 Administrative Record Part 147)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 59 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 142, #2 Administrative Record Part 143, #3 Administrative Record Part 144)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 58 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 139, #2 Administrative Record Part 140, #3 Administrative Record Part 141)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 57 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 136, #2 Administrative Record Part 137, #3 Administrative Record Part 138)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 56 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 133, #2 Administrative Record Part 134, #3 Administrative Record Part 135)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 55 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 130, #2 Administrative Record Part 131, #3 Administrative Record Part 132)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 54 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 127, #2 Administrative Record Part 128, #3 Administrative Record Part 129)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 53 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 124, #2 Administrative Record Part 125, #3 Administrative Record Part 126)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 52 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 121, #2 Administrative Record Part 122, #3 Administrative Record Part 123)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 51 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 118, #2 Administrative Record Part 119, #3 Administrative Record Part 120)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 50 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 115, #2 Administrative Record Part 116, #3 Administrative Record Part 117)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 49 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 112, #2 Administrative Record Part 113, #3 Administrative Record Part 114)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 48 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 109, #2 Administrative Record Part 110, #3 Administrative Record Part 111)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 47 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 106, #2 Administrative Record Part 107, #3 Administrative Record Part 108)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 46 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 103, #2 Administrative Record Part 104, #3 Administrative Record Part 105)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 45 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 100, #2 Administrative Record Part 101, #3 Administrative Record Part 102)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 44 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 97, #2 Administrative Record Part 98, #3 Administrative Record Part 99)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 43 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 94, #2 Administrative Record Part 95, #3 Administrative Record Part 96)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 42 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 91, #2 Administrative Record Part 92, #3 Administrative Record Part 93)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 41 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 88, #2 Administrative Record Part 89, #3 Administrative Record Part 90)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 40 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 85, #2 Administrative Record Part 86, #3 Administrative Record Part 87)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 39 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 82, #2 Administrative Record Part 83, #3 Administrative Record Part 84)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 38 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 79, #2 Administrative Record Part 80, #3 Administrative Record Part 81)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 37 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 76, #2 Administrative Record Part 77, #3 Administrative Record Part 78)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 36 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 73, #2 Administrative Record Part 74, #3 Administrative Record Part 75)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 35 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 70, #2 Administrative Record Part 71, #3 Administrative Record Part 72)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 34 Sealed Document --Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 67, #2 Administrative Record Part 68, #3 Administrative Record Part 69)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 33 Sealed Document re #12 Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 64, #2 Administrative Record Part 65, #3 Administrative Record Part 66)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 32 Sealed Document Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 61, #2 Administrative Record Part 62, #3 Administrative Record Part 63)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 Sealed Document Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 58, #2 Administrative Record Part 59, #3 Administrative Record Part 60)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 30 Sealed Document Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 55, #2 Administrative Record Part 56, #3 Administrative Record Part 57)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 29 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 52, #2 Administrative Record Part 53, #3 Administrative Record Part 54)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 28 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 49, #2 Administrative Record Part 50, #3 Administrative Record Part 51)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 27 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 46, #2 Administrative Record Part 47, #3 Administrative Record Part 48)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 26 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 43, #2 Administrative Record Part 44, #3 Administrative Record Part 45)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 25 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 40, #2 Administrative Record Part 41, #3 Administrative Record Part 42)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 37, #2 Administrative Record Part 38, #3 Administrative Record Part 39)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 23 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 34, #2 Administrative Record Part 35, #3 Administrative Record Part 36)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 22 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 31, #2 Administrative Record Part 32, #3 Administrative Record Part 33)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 28, #2 Administrative Record Part 29, #3 Administrative Record Part 30)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 20 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 25, #2 Administrative Record Part 26, #3 Administrative Record Part 27)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 19 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 22, #2 Administrative Record Part 23, #3 Administrative Record Part 24)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 18 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 19, #2 Administrative Record Part 20, #3 Administrative Record Part 21)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 16, #2 Administrative Record Part 17, #3 Administrative Record Part 18)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 13, #2 Administrative Record Part 14, #3 Administrative Record Part 15)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 10, #2 Administrative Record Part 11, #3 Administrative Record Part 12)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 Sealed Document - Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 7, #2 Administrative Record Part 8, #3 Administrative Record Part 9)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 Sealed Document -- Notice of Continued Filing of Administrative Record re #12 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 4, #2 Administrative Record Part 5, #3 Administrative Record Part 6)(Sawert, Peter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 Sealed Document -- Notice of Filing of Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Index, #2 Administrative Record Part 1, #3 Administrative Record Part 2, #4 Administrative Record Part 3)(Sawert, Peter)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrei Iancu, filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt.(DeLaquil, Mark)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. as to U.S. Attorney served on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Service returned executed by Certified Mail as to U.S. Attorney General and Andrei Iancu (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 US Attorney EDVA)(DeLaquil, Mark) Modified on 10/8/2020 to correct served and answer due date (klau, ).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew M. Grossman. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/27/2020. (aott)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew M. Grossman and Certification of Local Counsel Mark W. DeLaquil Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7372647. by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Andrei Iancu, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. (klau, )
August 25, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Gilbert P. Hyatt (Proposed AO 120 Form) (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to U.S. Attorney for the EDVA by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Attorney General of the United States by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Andrei Iancu ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7366298.), filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaquil, Mark) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Represented By: Peter John Sawert
Represented By: John Daniel Victor Ferman
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Represented By: Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?