Tibbetts et al v. Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC et al
Plaintiff: R Thomas Tibbetts and Kristen Tibbetts
Defendant: Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC and Dircks Moving Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01044
Filed: September 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:11706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint filed by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Douglas, Denise)
October 28, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Dircks Moving Services, Inc. Objection to Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint filed by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Douglas, Denise)
October 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint., ***Motion Hearing terminated #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. Motion Hearing reset for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the hearing on the re #18 Motion for Leave to File the First Amended Complaint will be on November 6, 200 at 10:00 a.m. Oral argument on defendants motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim shall be held in abeyance until the motion for leave to file the first amended complaint is resolved (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/27/2020. (lcre, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 EXHIBIT Proposed Order by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC.. (Glajch, Jessica)
October 22, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition to #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC. (Glajch, Jessica)
October 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #23 Joint MOTION for Extension and to Set Briefing Schedule (clar, )
October 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #23 Joint MOTION for Extension and to Set Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Douglas, Denise)
October 21, 2020 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension and to Set Briefing Schedule by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Douglas, Denise)
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC. (Glajch, Jessica)
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 Objection to #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Dircks Moving Services, Inc.. (Cox, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Douglas, Denise)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redlined Version of Complaint and First Amended Complaint)(Douglas, Denise)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Douglas, Denise)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dircks Moving Services, Inc.. (Cox, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Douglas, Denise)
September 23, 2020 Dircks Moving Services, Inc. answer due 9/8/2020. (lcre, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts of Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service on Dircks Moving Services, Inc.)(Douglas, Denise)
September 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Remote (Teleconference) before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Dircks Moving Services, Inc. (Doc. # 3, filed September 8, 2020) no later than October 6, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC (Doc. # 10, filed September 16, 2020) no later than October 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 09/18/20. (cmar, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Douglas, Denise)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cox, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Notice of Correction: Filer has been notified to file a notice of hearing or waiver of oral argument re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (lcre, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gwen Vickers)(Glajch, Jessica)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Glajch, Jessica)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Michelle Douglas on behalf of Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts (Douglas, Denise)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kristen Tibbetts, R Thomas Tibbetts of Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service on Defendant Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC)(Douglas, Denise)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Montgomery on behalf of Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC (Montgomery, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Notice of Correction: Filer has been notified to separate pleadings as separate docket entries in the future. Please use appropriate event to file memorandum in the future. No action is needed at this time re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (lcre, )
September 9, 2020 Notice of Correction : Filer has been notified to file a notice of hearing or waiver of oral argument re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (lcre, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC. (Glajch, Jessica)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ashley Glajch on behalf of Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC (Glajch, Jessica)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Husk on behalf of Dircks Moving Services, Inc. (Husk, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dircks Moving Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
September 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dircks Moving Services, Inc.. (Cox, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7386394.), filed by Dircks Moving Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Removal Consent, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff Removal Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Cir. Court Notice)(Cox, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tibbetts et al v. Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Ashley Glajch
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dircks Moving Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ellison Cox
Represented By: John T. Husk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Thomas Tibbetts
Represented By: Denise Michelle Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Tibbetts
Represented By: Denise Michelle Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?