Paradise IP LLC v. Axway Inc.
Plaintiff: Paradise IP LLC
Defendant: Axway Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01144
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Axway Inc. answer due 12/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/04/2020. (jlan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Axway Inc.. (Rochford, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (lcre, )(c/s)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Paradise IP LLC AO 120, Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Notice of Correction: Filer has been notified to submit AO 120 Form. (lcre, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Axway Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(lcre, )
September 30, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Paradise IP LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paradise IP LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Paradise IP LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7423589.), filed by Paradise IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradise IP LLC v. Axway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axway Inc.
Represented By: Richard Drake Rochford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradise IP LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?