Fusion IP LLC v. Blackboard Inc.
Plaintiff: Fusion IP LLC
Defendant: Blackboard Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01267
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark - DISPOSITION . (pmil, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the request to dismiss this matter with prejudice is GRANTED. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/17/20. (pmil, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fusion IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 12, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Routh, Jennifer)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Blackboard Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Routh Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Routh, Jennifer)
November 11, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Blackboard Inc.. (Routh, Jennifer)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Butler Routh on behalf of Blackboard Inc. (Routh, Jennifer)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Blackboard Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent nos. 6,344,902; 7,020,670; 7,941,486. (pmil, )
October 27, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (pmil, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Fusion IP LLC AO 120, Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Fusion IP LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fusion IP LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Fusion IP LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7466623.), filed by Fusion IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusion IP LLC v. Blackboard Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackboard Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Butler Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fusion IP LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?