7-Eleven, Inc. v. 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Defendant: Nehemias O. Salvador and 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01269
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 Response to #1 Complaint filed by Nehemias O. Salvador. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlan)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 7-Eleven, Inc. Nehemias O. Salvador served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020 (Vold, Tara)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 7-Eleven, Inc. 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020 (Vold, Tara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC, Nehemias O. Salvador. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
October 27, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (jlan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Vold, Tara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Nehemias O. Salvador by 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Vold, Tara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC by 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Vold, Tara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7466882.), filed by 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Vold, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7-Eleven, Inc. v. 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Marie Vold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nehemias O. Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Seven Store & Grocery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?