United States of America v. Parsons et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carla M Parsons and James S Parsons
Case Number: 1:2020cv01322
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America Carla M Parsons served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020 (Mene, Gerard)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America James S Parsons served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020 (Mene, Gerard)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/13/2020. (rban, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carla M Parsons, James S Parsons. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Benton Thomas Morton and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
November 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint James S. Parsons by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mene, Gerard)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Carla M. Parsons by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mene, Gerard)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mene, Gerard) (choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Parsons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla M Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?