UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $4,543.79 seized from U.S. Bank Acct. 153568031006 et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $25,343.01 seized from Citibank Acct. 145947373, $1,217.05 seized from American Express National Bank Acct. 320013539278, $13,559.97 seized from Captial One Bank Acct. 1361410762, $491,780.50 seized from Signature Bank Acct. ending in 5810, $4,284.47 seized from American Express National Bank Acct. 1518835838, $10,567.43 seized from U.S. Bank Acct. 104781237441, $98,358.92 seized from Citibank Acct. 149656681, $4,543.79 seized from U.S. Bank Acct. 153568031006 and $8,388.54 seized from Wells Fargo Acct. 1635892407
Claimant: Amy Nelson, Carleton Nelson, E2M Properties, LLC and Casey Kirschner
Case Number: 1:2020cv01343
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Amy Nelson, Carleton Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Preston)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 Redacted version of Assertion of Claim. (dvanm, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 Unredacted Assertion of Claim. (dvanm, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 CLAIM Verified by Amy Nelson, Carleton Nelson. (Smith, Preston)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 CLAIM Verified by E2M Properties, LLC. (Sears, Stuart)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Alexander Sears on behalf of E2M Properties, LLC (Sears, Stuart)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Suneeta Hazra and Certification of Local Counsel Preston Smith Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7524395. by Amy Nelson, Carleton Nelson. (Smith, Preston)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Preston Michael Smith on behalf of Amy Nelson, Carleton Nelson (Smith, Preston)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #3 Warrant Issued Return of Warrant in rem (Hudson, Kevin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT In Rem issued (dvanm, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Application - Warrant For Arrest in rem (Attachments: #1 proposed warrant)(Hudson, Kevin)
November 9, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(Hudson, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $4,543.79 seized from U.S. Bank Acct. 153568031006 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,343.01 seized from Citibank Acct. 145947373
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,217.05 seized from American Express National Bank Acct. 320013539278
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,559.97 seized from Captial One Bank Acct. 1361410762
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $491,780.50 seized from Signature Bank Acct. ending in 5810
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,284.47 seized from American Express National Bank Acct. 1518835838
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,567.43 seized from U.S. Bank Acct. 104781237441
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $98,358.92 seized from Citibank Acct. 149656681
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,543.79 seized from U.S. Bank Acct. 153568031006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,388.54 seized from Wells Fargo Acct. 1635892407
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amy Nelson
Represented By: Preston Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carleton Nelson
Represented By: Preston Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: E2M Properties, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Alexander Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Casey Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?