Philpot v. Turley
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Jonathan Turley
Case Number: 1:2020cv01349
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Jonathan Turley.(Warrington, David)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Warrington on behalf of Jonathan Turley (Warrington, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry G. Philpot Jonathan Turley served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Maher, Kristine)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Turley. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(ahas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright filed. (c/s to Copyright Office.). (ahas)
November 9, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (ahas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine Marie Maher on behalf of Larry G. Philpot (Maher, Kristine)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Larry G. Philpot. (Maher, Kristine)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7487650.), filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subject Photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Images, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maher, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Kristine Marie Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Turley
Represented By: David Alan Warrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?