Blix v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: William Blix
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01357
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate Regarding Discovery by William Blix.(Kearney, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate Regarding Discovery by William Blix.(Kearney, James)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate Regarding Discovery by William Blix.(Kearney, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 Rule 26 Disclosure by William Blix. (Kearney, James)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 5), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 4 ), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/04/2021. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Murdock, John)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 4/9/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Murdock, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Murdock, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7492027.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murdock, John)
November 12, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blix v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Blix
Represented By: James Robert Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?