Williams v. Howerton
Plaintiff: Kimberly Williams
Defendant: Kenneth Howerton, Jr.
Petitioner: Hyland Law PLLC and Timothy B. Hyland
Case Number: 1:2020cv01391
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis.Discovery due by 5/14/2021.Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Kenneth Howerton, Jr.(Igiel, Jay)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kenneth Howerton, Jr answer due 1/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/17/2020. (dvanm, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kenneth Howerton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Igiel, Jay)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Ian Igiel on behalf of Kenneth Howerton, Jr (Igiel, Jay)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that any objection to the Motion to Withdraw be filed by December 30,2020. If no objection is filed, the Motion to Withdraw #4 will be summarily granted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/15/2020. (dvanm, c/s 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (clar, )
December 15, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date re #4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Hyland, Timothy)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Timothy B. Hyland, Hyland Law PLLC. (Hyland, Timothy)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hyland Law PLLC, Timothy B. Hyland. (Hyland, Timothy)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Williams Kenneth Howerton, Jr served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020 (Hyland, Timothy)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Howerton, Jr. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7497587.), filed by Kimberly Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hyland, Timothy)
November 16, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Howerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Williams
Represented By: Timothy Brooks Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Howerton, Jr.
Represented By: Jay Ian Igiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hyland Law PLLC
Represented By: Timothy Brooks Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy B. Hyland
Represented By: Timothy Brooks Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?