Baybrook v. Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573
Plaintiff: Jami Baybrook
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573
Case Number: 1:2020cv01435
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - This matter comes before the Court on the parties Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #5 ). Based on the parties representations in their discovery plan, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 17, 2021 shall be canceled. Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings:1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #5 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter.(SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/12/2021. (lcre, )
February 12, 2021 Initial Pretrial Conference set for 02/17/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff TERMINATED. (lcre, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573.(Murdock, John)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(tarm, )
November 20, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573. (Murdock, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573.(Murdock, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7506223.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murdock, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baybrook v. Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East d/b/a Wal-Mart Store #3573
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Baybrook
Represented By: Brian McCabe Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?