Buckmire et al v. Lasership Inc.
Plaintiff: Anderson Buckmire and Justin Nardone
Defendant: Lasership Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01493
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sanchez Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Tavares Memorandum and Order)(Hanna, Mark)
January 13, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing Date re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Mann, Kim)
January 13, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Lasership Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Didier Milongo, #3 Proposed Order)(Mann, Kim)
January 13, 2021 Filing 19 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lasership Inc.. (Mann, Kim)
January 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
January 13, 2021 Per RDA chambers motions set for 2/3/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Adam C. Smedstad. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 01/07/2021. (dvanm, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice as to James A. Eckhart. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 01/07/2021. (dvanm, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Andrew J. Butcher. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 01/07/2021. (dvanm, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James A. Eckhart and Certification of Local Counsel Kim D. Mann Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7569080. by Lasership Inc.. (Mann, Kim)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Butcher and Certification of Local Counsel Kim D. Mann Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7569071. by Lasership Inc.. (Mann, Kim)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam C. Smedstad and Certification of Local Counsel Kim D. Mann Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7569058. by Lasership Inc.. (Mann, Kim)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Harold Louis Lichten. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/30/2020. (dvanm, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Michelle Ruth Cassorla. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/30/2020. (dvanm, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lasership Inc. answer due 1/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/23/2020. (dvanm, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lasership Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Mann, Kim)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim Dennehey Mann on behalf of Lasership Inc. (Mann, Kim)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle Ruth Cassorla and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Hanna Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7553847. by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Hanna, Mark)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harold Louis Lichten and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Hanna Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7553828. by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Hanna, Mark)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons (x2), Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Notice served on Rene Nordquist, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent of Lasership Inc. on 12/09/2020, filed by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Hanna, Mark)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lasership Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons (refiled at the request of Case Manager) by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Hanna, Mark)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Defendant LaserShip Inc. by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Hanna, Mark) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/4/2020) (dvanm, ).
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7526938.), filed by Anderson Buckmire, Justin Nardone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2020) (dvanm, ). Modified to replace fillable form on 12/4/2020 (dvanm, ).
December 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
December 4, 2020 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the proposed summons is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckmire et al v. Lasership Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasership Inc.
Represented By: Kim Dennehey Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Buckmire
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Nardone
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?