FIORANI v. PNC BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rosario "Ross&quot Fiorani
Defendant: Karen Hicks, PNC Bank N.A., Christabel Ifeoma Obi, Sherry Cooper and Jane Does And/Or John Does, 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv01580
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03200. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CORRECT THE SPELLING OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST NAME ON THE DOCKET TO REFLECT THE PROPER SPELLING IS "ROSARIO" AS SET FORTH IN THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/24/20. 9/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KAREN HICKS, JANE DOES AND/OR JOHN DOES, 1-10, PNC BANK, N.A., PNC BANK, N.A., filed by ROASRIO "ROSS" FIORANI, JR.NO IFP, NO FEE PAID. (Attachments: #1 TRACK FORM, #2 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2020.]
June 29, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROASRIO "ROSS" FIORANI, JR. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIORANI v. PNC BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christabel Ifeoma Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does And/Or John Does, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario "Ross&quot Fiorani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?