Concentric Methods LLC v. Doki
Plaintiff: Concentric Methods LLC
Defendant: Naveen Doki, Suresh Venkat Doki, Madhavi Doki, Shirisha Janumpally and Federal Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01600
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 So Ordered re #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Concentric Methods LLC. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/17/21. (klau, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Concentric Methods LLC (Ramana, Anand)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that on or before February 24, 2021 at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff Concentric Methods LLC shall file a brief addressing (1) whether Plaintiff's principal place of business is in Virginia, (2) whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, and (3) whether Virginia state courts can enforce the Virginia state court judgement at issue here. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a notice of voluntary dismissal.It is further ORDERED that on or before March 3, 2021 at 5:00 p.m., Defendants may file a brief responding to Plaintiff's submission. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 02/09/2021. (tran)
February 9, 2021 Notice of Correction re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts I, II, VI & VII, #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint), The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts I, II, VI & VII filed by Madhavi Doki. (Saboura-Polkovotsy, Elias)
February 8, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Counts I, II, VI & VII by Madhavi Doki. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saboura-Polkovotsy, Elias)
February 6, 2021 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, LLC, Shirisha Janumpally. (Palik, Craig)
February 6, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint) by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, LLC, Shirisha Janumpally. (Palik, Craig)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Defendants have until February 6, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 2/1/21. (klau, )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and response shall be filed by Madhavi Doki no later than February 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 2/1/21. (klau, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 18 Waiver of re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Affidavit of Service, #1 Complaint Waiver of a Hearing by Madhavi Doki (Saboura-Polkovotsy, Elias)
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Affidavit of Service, #1 Complaint by Madhavi Doki. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saboura-Polkovotsy, Elias)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, LLC, Shirisha Janumpally re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint (Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument) (Palik, Craig)
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, LLC, Shirisha Janumpally. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palik, Craig)
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service/Summons Returned Executed for Summons and Complaint as to Federal Systems, LLC served on January 6, 2021, answer due 1/27/21, filed by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) Modified on 1/14/2021 to add answer due date (klau, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service/Summons Returned Executed for Summons and Complaint as to Shirisha Janumpally served on January 6, 2021, answer due date 1/27/21, filed by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) Modified on 1/14/2021 to add answer due date (klau, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service/Summons Returned Executed for Summons and Complaint as to Naveen Doki served on January 6, 2021, answer due 1/27/21, filed by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) Modified on 1/14/2021 to add answer due date (klau, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service/Summons Returned Executed for Summons and Complaint as to Madhavi Doki served on January 8, 2021, answer due 1/29/21 ,filed by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) Modified on 1/14/2021 to add answer due date (klau, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service/Summons Returned Executed for Summons and Complaint as to Suresh Doki served on January 8, 2021, , answer due 1/29/21 ,filed by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) Modified on 1/14/2021 to set answer due date(klau, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Madhavi Doki, Naveen Doki, Suresh Venkat Doki, Federal Systems, LLC, Shirisha Janumpally. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Federal Systems, LLC by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/30/2020) (shea, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint S. Janumpally by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/30/2020) (shea, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint M. Doki by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/30/2020) (shea, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint N. Doki by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/30/2020) (shea, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint S. V. Doki by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/30/2020) (shea, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Concentric Methods LLC. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/30/2020) (shea, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7562891.), filed by Concentric Methods LLC.(Ramana, Anand)
December 30, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concentric Methods LLC v. Doki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naveen Doki
Represented By: Craig Michael Palik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suresh Venkat Doki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madhavi Doki
Represented By: Elias George Saboura-Polkovotsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirisha Janumpally
Represented By: Craig Michael Palik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Systems, LLC
Represented By: Craig Michael Palik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concentric Methods LLC
Represented By: Anand Vijay Ramana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?