Kappel v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Carla J Kappel
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02825
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carla J Kappel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(aott, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (1923) Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN; granting in part and denying in part (25) Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment in case 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN. ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file any opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment by 11/6/2020. No further extensions granted in connection with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Lacy, Michael)
October 26, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting (1920) Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment. ORDERED that the Plaintiff will have until October 23, 2020 to respond to defendant's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/14/20. (cmar, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED, that Defendant is granted an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses and General Denial until 14 days after entry of the Court's ruling and Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/2/2020. (rban, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses and General Denial (Unopposed) by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacy, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (Lacy, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Enroughty Declaration), #3 Exhibit 3 (Earle Declaration))(Lacy, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacy, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting (1906) Motion for Pro hac vice in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Power and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Lacy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7406901. by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Lacy, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Halli Dee Cohn and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Lacy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7406881. by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Lacy, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward Lacy on behalf of Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (Lacy, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that the Settlement Administrator shall, no later than 90 days after entry of this Court's 9/3/2020 Order, distribute cash from the Escrow Account and the voucher portion of the Settlement to qualified claimants in the manner set forth in the Settlement Agreement. The Settlement Administrator is directed to post this Order on the class action website. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that, on or before 9/15/2020, Class Counsel shall deposit into the Escrow Account the interest that would have accrued on the attorneys' fees, costs and expenses previously-withdrawn from the Escrow Account pursuant to Paragraph 12(B) of the Settlement Agreement from the date of disbursement(s) through the Effective Date, September 3, 2020, and shall file with the Court an appropriate accounting. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05123. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia the electronic record. (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to United StatesDistrict Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2627 Conditional Transfer Order filed 9/10/2020, mc. [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carla J Kappel by Robert John Augenlicht (Augenlicht, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.(DiRago, Mary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc. by Mary S DiRago (DiRago, Mary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Lumber Liquidators, Inc., a Delaware corporation re notice of removal, #1 (DiRago, Mary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DiRago, Mary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from In the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, County Department, Law Division, case number (2020 L 007648) filed by Lumber Liquidators, Inc., a Delaware corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17380252. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DiRago, Mary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kappel v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Represented By: Mary S. DiRago
Represented By: Michael Edward Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla J Kappel
Represented By: Robert John Augenlicht
Represented By: Kenneth G. Anspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?