Abushammaleh v. Ross Dress For Less, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Abushammaleh
Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc. and Beijing Anhua Quality International Trade Co., LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00044
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 24 Waiver of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 15] by Ross Dress For Less, Inc. (Hoyle, James)
February 24, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James Leslie Hoyle on behalf of Ross Dress For Less, Inc. (Hoyle, James)
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 1 Count in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Cafritz, Brian)
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 1 Count in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Ahmed Abushammaleh. (Sutter, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Ordered dismissal of Defendant Beijing Anhua Quality International Trade Co., LTD only without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A) (i, re #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ahmed Abushammaleh. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/10/2021. (lber)
February 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Beijing Anhua Quality International Trade Co., Ltd Only by Ahmed Abushammaleh (Sutter, Matthew)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #13 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 10, 2021, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's January 14, 2021, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/8/2021. (lgue, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 17 Waiver of re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 1 Count in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #16 Memorandum in Support by Ross Dress For Less, Inc. (Cafritz, Brian)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 1 Count in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Cafritz, Brian)
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 1 Count in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cafritz, Brian)
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Ross Dress For Less, Inc..(Cafritz, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Discovery Plan by Ross Dress For Less, Inc..(Cafritz, Brian)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Beijing Anhua Quality International Trade Co., LTD.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re #9 Amended Complaint by Ahmed Abushammaleh. (Sutter, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ORDERED that Defendant file its response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #9 within ten (10) days of this Order and notice hearing in accordance with this Court's local rules. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/27/2021. (lcre, )
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ahmed Abushammaleh.(Sutter, Matthew)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ahmed Abushammaleh. (Sutter, Matthew)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Sutter on behalf of Ahmed Abushammaleh (Sutter, Matthew)
January 18, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Oral Argument by Ross Dress For Less, Inc. (Cafritz, Brian)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Cafritz, Brian)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cafritz, Brian)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
January 14, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lcre, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Cafritz, Brian)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7581312.), filed by Ross Dress For Less, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cafritz, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abushammaleh v. Ross Dress For Less, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Allen Cafritz
Represented By: James Leslie Hoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing Anhua Quality International Trade Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Abushammaleh
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Sutter
Represented By: Samer W. Burgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?