UNITED STATES v. First Baptist Church of Sterling
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Defendant: First Baptist Church of Sterling
Case Number: 1:2021cv00051
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to First Baptist Church of Sterling. (dvanm, )
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Entry of Default as to First Baptist Church of Sterling by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mene, Gerard)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES All Defendants (Mene, Gerard)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Emily Katherine Miller. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/27/2021. (dvanm, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Gokce Tugce Yurekli. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/27/2021. (dvanm, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily K. Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gokce T. Yurekli and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard)
January 22, 2021 Notice of Correction re #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Katherine Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene , #7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gokce Tugce Yurekli and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene. The filing user has been notified that document [document number] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gokce Tugce Yurekli and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/22/2021) (dvanm, ).
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Katherine Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/22/2021) (dvanm, ).
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Mene on behalf of UNITED STATES (Mene, Gerard)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Mene on behalf of UNITED STATES (Mene, Gerard)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to First Baptist Church of Sterling. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
January 19, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint FOR FEDERAL TAXES by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/19/2021) (dvanm, ).
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint FOR FEDERAL TAXES, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mene, Gerard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/19/2021) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES v. First Baptist Church of Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Baptist Church of Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?