Whittman v. Associa, Associations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Whittman
Defendant: Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association), CMC (Community Management Corporation) and Associa, Associations, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00077
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Whittman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kgall)
February 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
February 26, 2021 Per RDA chambers motions set for 4/7/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association), CMC (Community Management Corporation), Associa, Associations, Inc.. (Mitchell, William)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date re #4 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,., #5 Memorandum in Support, (Mitchell, William)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. filed by Associa, Associations, Inc., CMC (Community Management Corporation), Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association). (Mitchell, William)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Associa, Associations, Inc., CMC (Community Management Corporation), Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association). (Mitchell, William)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued to be served as to Associa, Associations, Inc., CMC (Community Management Corporation), Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association). (Summons mailed to Plaintiff) (jlan)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by William Whittman. (pmil, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Associa, Associations, Inc., CMC (Community Management Corporation), Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association) filed by William Whittman ( Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 14683088349). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pmil, ) Modified on 1/27/2021 to add receipt number and receipt (pmil, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2021: #2 Receipt) (pmil, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittman v. Associa, Associations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodburn Village Condominium Unit Owners Association and/or Woodburn Vlg Condo Unit Owners (The association)
Represented By: William Leonard Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC (Community Management Corporation)
Represented By: William Leonard Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associa, Associations, Inc.
Represented By: William Leonard Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Whittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?