Hayden v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Hayden
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00148
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Baker, Jeremy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Baker, Jeremy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Baker, Jeremy)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/13/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Theresa Buchanan on 3/4/2021. (shea) Modifie
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
February 10, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (shea)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Kelly Hayden. (Kelly, Kristi)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7621123.), filed by Kelly Hayden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Hayden
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?