Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Winix America, Inc., IEI Consulting, Inc., Gott Auto Body Limited, Winix, Inc and Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00167
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company as to Winix, Inc. (Rosenblum, David)
April 6, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Gott Auto Body Limited re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #27 Memorandum in Support, Request Substitution of Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Caron Gott)(Bardot, Heather)
April 5, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Hearing Date set for 06/04/2021 re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #27 Memorandum in Support, (Bardot, Heather)
April 5, 2021 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gott Auto Body Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Suit, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Carol Gott)(Bardot, Heather) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/6/2021 per counsel request).
April 5, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Gott Auto Body Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather)
April 5, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE in re Gott Auto Body Limited, IEI Consulting, Inc., Winix America, Inc. (kgall)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint IEI Consulting, Inc. answer due 4/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 4/2/2021. (lcre, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Quinn Adams on behalf of IEI Consulting, Inc. (Adams, Christopher)
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by IEI Consulting, Inc.. (Yates, Harry)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company upon Sec of the Commonwealth for Winix America, Inc (Rosenblum, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company uponSec. of the Commonwealth for IEI Consulting, Inc. (Rosenblum, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #10 Summons Issued to Sec of the Commwealth for Gott Autobody Limited (Rosenblum, David)
March 26, 2021 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Gott Auto Body Limited. (Bardot, Heather)
March 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Kathleen Bardot on behalf of Gott Auto Body Limited (Bardot, Heather)
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winix America, Inc.. (Pivor, Michael)
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Winix America, Inc..(Pivor, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 So Ordered re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company as to Defendant Sears, Roebuck and Co. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/4/2021. (kgall)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice for Matthew Noone. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 3/2/2021. (kgall)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Sears, Roebuck and Co., under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew F. Noone and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7642631. by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit)(kgall)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons Amended to Winix, Inc by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Winex Inc by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Winix, Inc. by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Sears, Roebuck &Co. by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to IEI Consulting, Inc., by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Gott Auto Body Limited by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint aso John Huzzard ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7624587.), filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblum, David)
February 11, 2021 Notice of Correction re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Advised counsel to refile with a signed version of Disclosure Statement. (kgall)
February 11, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winix America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEI Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Christopher Quinn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gott Auto Body Limited
Represented By: Heather Kathleen Bardot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winix, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?