PJF Limited Partnership v. Bank Of America, N.A et al
Plaintiff: PJF Limited Partnership
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 1:2021cv00180
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society. (Narod, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Per RDA chambers motions set for 4/2/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society. (Narod, Andrew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Hearing Date of April 2, 2021 re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Narod, Andrew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society. (Narod, Andrew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Narod, Andrew)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Circuit Court of Fauquier County ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7633208.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, Wilmington Savings Fund Society/NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Narod, Andrew) Modified on 2/18/2021 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PJF Limited Partnership v. Bank Of America, N.A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PJF Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?