Bonetti v. City of Alexandria, Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Eric J. Bonetti
Defendant: Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church, Robert Hiller Malm, City of Alexandria, Virginia, Episcopal Diocese of Massachusetts and Commonwealth of Virginia
Case Number: 1:2021cv00190
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 38 Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendant Episcopal Diocese of Virginia by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 37 Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendant Grace Episcopal Church by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 36 Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Robert Hiller Malm by Eric J. Bonetti. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(klau, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Eric J. Bonetti re #34 Memorandum (klau, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 34 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 33 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 32 Brief in Support of Injunction Against Defendant Malm filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Virginia. Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit)(kgall)
April 15, 2021 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric J. Bonetti.(kgall)
April 15, 2021 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re #16 MOTION for injunction filed by Robert Hiller Malm. (Cyron, Wayne)
April 14, 2021 Filing 28 Plaintiff's Third BRIEF in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (lber)
April 14, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION Plaintiff Second Brief filed by Robert Hiller Malm. (Cyron, Wayne)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that plaintiff's updated #23 Motion to Amend is granted and plaintiff's #14 Motion to Amend is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as a separate docket entry within seven (7) days of this order. Defendants may renew their motions to dismiss to the amended complaint if they believe it is appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/12/21. Copy mailed by chambers. (klau, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 25 Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to the City of Alexandria's Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (kgall)
April 1, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED PRAECIPE - Corrects Erroneous Date by Eric J. Bonetti. (kgall)
April 1, 2021 Filing 23 Updated Plaintiffs Motion to Amend by Eric J. Bonetti. (kgall)
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 Plaintiff's Second Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (kgall)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 Praecipe - NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Injunction, #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct : Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Plaintiff has been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing (5/22/2021 is a Saturday) - Deadlines Terminated(clar, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. filed by Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church, Robert Hiller Malm. (Youssef, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by City of Alexandria, Virginia. (McAndrews, George)
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by City of Alexandria, Virginia. (McAndrews, George)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Alexandria, Virginia.(McAndrews, George)
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Injunction filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kgall)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' re #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6)(Robert H. Malm, Grace Episcopal Church, and Episcopal diocese of Virginia), filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend by Eric J. Bonetti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(klau, )
March 24, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne F. Cyron on behalf of Robert Hiller Malm (klau, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert Hiller Malm waiver sent on 3/21/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (klau, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date re #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. (Youssef, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig David Roswell on behalf of Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church (Roswell, Craig)
March 23, 2021 Notice of Correction re #6 Notice of Appearance. The filing user has been notified to have Craig Roswell, Esq. using his own login password to refile Notice of Appearance. (klau, )
March 23, 2021 Notice of Correction re #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro, The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, )
March 23, 2021 Notice of Correction re #13 Notice of Appearance. Counsel has been notified that all future filing need to be filed electronically. (klau, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church, Robert Hiller Malm. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Roseboro Warning)(Youssef, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church, Robert Hiller Malm. (Youssef, Matthew) Modified text on 3/23/2021 Counsel refiled same motion together with memorandum in support as Dkt. No. 9 (klau, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church. (Youssef, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Youssef on behalf of Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church (Youssef, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued and mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff for service by SPS as to City of Alexandria, Virginia, Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church, Robert Hiller Malm. (klau, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 14683088817. (kgall)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m on 2/23/21) (klau, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Eric J. Bonetti. (klau, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Alexandria, Virginia, Episcopal Diocese of Virginia, Grace Episcopal Church, Robert Hiller Malm ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 14683xxxxx.), filed by Eric J. Bonetti. (received filing fee and will be processed by cashier)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonetti v. City of Alexandria, Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J. Bonetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Diocese of Virginia
Represented By: Matthew James Youssef
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Episcopal Church
Represented By: Matthew James Youssef
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hiller Malm
Represented By: Matthew James Youssef
Represented By: Wayne F. Cyron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alexandria, Virginia
Represented By: George McAndrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Diocese of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?