UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $800,000 seized from Wells Fargo Account ending 5799
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $800,000 seized from Wells Fargo Account ending 5799
Claimant: 2010 Trust
Case Number: 1:2021cv00205
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. 1. This civil forfeiture case is stayed for a period of six months from the date of the entry of this Order. 2. Claimant will have twenty-one days from the date the stay is lifted to file an answer or permitted motion to the Complaint. 3. The government shall notify the Court of any indictment of the claimant or the disposition of any criminal case against him no more than sixty days following that disposition or indictment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 04/15/2021. (dvanm, )
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudson, Kevin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 WARRANT in Rem issued. (dvanm, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 CLAIM Verified by 2010 Trust. (Leibig, Christopher)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leibig on behalf of 2010 Trust (Leibig, Christopher)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Application for Warrant of Arrest in rem (Attachments: #1 proposed warrant)(Hudson, Kevin)
February 22, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(Hudson, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $800,000 seized from Wells Fargo Account ending 5799
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $800,000 seized from Wells Fargo Account ending 5799
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 2010 Trust
Represented By: Christopher Leibig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?