Twin-Soft Corporation v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Unites States Of America
Defendant: Twin-Soft Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00214
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Unites States Of America re #7 Request for Entry of Default as to Twin-Soft Corporation Amended Certificate of Service (Mene, Gerard)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Entry of Default as to Twin-Soft Corporation by Unites States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mene, Gerard)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unites States Of America Twin-Soft Corporation served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021 (Mene, Gerard)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Emily Katherine Miller. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 02/25/2021. (lber)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Unites States Of America. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (lber)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily K. Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by Unites States Of America. (Mene, Gerard) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/25/2021) (lber, ).
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/25/2021) (lber, ).
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for Federal Taxes and Injunctive Relief, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mene, Gerard)
February 25, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin-Soft Corporation v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unites States Of America
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin-Soft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?